+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 615 (Ch. 2022-168)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Judiciary Committee
- Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
- CS Filed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
- Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On December 6, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
- Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
On November 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
622637 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/3/2022)
Remove lines 32-36 and insert:
269573 - Amendment (Adopted 2/8/2022)
Between lines 26 and 27, insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 16.618 - Direct-support organization.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor