+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-229
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Withdrawn from Rules
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 2
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Local Calendar, 04/29/14
- Received
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/03/14, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/27/14, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2014: Floor vote: H 0605
- Yeas: 40
April 25, 2014: Floor vote: H 0605
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor