+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Referred to Commerce Committee
- Referred to Ways & Means Committee
- Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 509.032 - Duties.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor