+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
- Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
- Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
On September 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor