+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Criminal Justice
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 88 NAYS 24
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 6
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/11/18, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
- Introduced
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 933.14 - Return of property taken under search warrant.
+ − Vote
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: H 6013
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 24