+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On September 17, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On August 2, 2021 in the House:
- Filed