+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2018-140
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 614
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 1
- Amendment(s) adopted (492903)
- Read 3rd time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 11/07/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Government Accountability Committee
- Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
492903 - Amendment
Remove line 171 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2018: Floor vote: H 6003 e1
- Yeas: 36
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: H 6003
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor