+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 534 (Ch. 2013-100)
- Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 534
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 9 NAYS 7
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 12
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/10/13, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 02/20/13, 11:30 am, Webster Hall
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
788233 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
049579 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Appropriations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor