+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-194
- Approved by Governor
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 25 NAYS 14
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for SB 162
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
- In Messages
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 74 NAYS 42
- Read 3rd time
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 3
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/03/14, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- CS referred to Judiciary Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/12/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On October 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On September 16, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
457221 - Substitute Amendment (848603)
Between lines 60 and 61, insert:
848603 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
944487 - Amendment
Remove line 211 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2014: Floor vote: H 0059 c1
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
April 11, 2014: Floor vote: H 0059 c1
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 42
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor