+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 442 (Ch. 2022-75)
- Substituted SB 442
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill released to House Calendar
- Reported out of State Affairs Committee
- Favorable by State Affairs Committee
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
- Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
- Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
On November 19, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
- Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 380.0666 - Powers of land authority.