+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 886 (Ch. 2020-33)
- Substituted SB 886
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/05/20
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- CS referred to Judiciary Committee
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/23/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
On November 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
557599 - Amendment (Adopted 1/16/2020)
Remove lines 147-148 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 694.18 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor