+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On November 19, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
- Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
- Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor