+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2017-134
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (323602)
- In returning messages
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Health Policy; Rules
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 328
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (323602)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Rules
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (208377, 356095, 442471, 505601)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/23/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (8)
323602 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
208377 - Amendment
Between lines 110 and 111, insert:
442471 - Amendment
Between lines 225 and 226, insert:
505601 - Amendment
Remove lines 1015-1021 and insert:
356095 - Amendment
Between lines 802 and 803, insert:
542731 - Amendment to Amendment (369409)
Between lines 682 and 683 of the amendment, insert:
369409 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
315165 - Amendment
Remove line 260 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (22)
- 464.012 - Certification of advanced registered nurse practitioners; fees; controlled substance prescribing.
- 464.013 - Renewal of license or certificate.
- 464.019 - Approval of nursing education programs.
- 384.4018 -
- 395.3025 - Patient and personnel records; copies; examination.
- 456.013 - Department; general licensing provisions.
- 456.025 - Fees; receipts; disposition.
- 456.065 - Unlicensed practice of a health care profession; intent; cease and desist notice; penalties; enforcement; citations; fees; allocation and disposition of moneys collected.
- 458.3265 - Pain-management clinics.
- 458.348 - Formal supervisory relationships, standing orders, and established protocols; notice; standards.
- 459.0137 - Pain-management clinics.
- 465.0195 -
- 465.027 - Exceptions.
- 468.80 - Definitions.
- 468.803 - License, registration, and examination requirements.
- 480.041 - Massage therapists; qualifications; licensure; endorsement.
- 486.102 - Physical therapist assistant; licensing requirements.
- 491.005 - Licensure by examination.
- 491.009 - Discipline.
- 381.0041 - Donation and transfer of human tissue; testing requirements.
- 456.0635 - Health care fraud; disqualification for license, certificate, or registration.
- 465.1893 -
+ − Votes (3)
May 5, 2017: Floor vote: H 543 e1
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 1
May 4, 2017: Floor vote: H 543 e1
- Yeas: 38
April 26, 2017: Floor vote: H 543 e1
- Yeas: 118