+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/15, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On December 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 215.555 - Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor