+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Chapter No. 2014-206, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 523 (Ch. 2014-205)
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 546
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
- In Messages
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 4
- Read 3rd time
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/20/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 02/18/14, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
462177 - Amendment
Remove line 30 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 790.0601 - Public records exemption for concealed weapons.
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2014: Floor vote: H 0525 c1
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
April 11, 2014: Floor vote: H 0525 c1
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor