+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2015-23)
- Substituted CS/SB 526
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- CS referred to Economic Affairs Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Business and Professions Subcommittee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
189193 - Amendment
Remove lines 25-45 and insert: