+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Now in State Affairs Committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/10/13, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/13/13, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
009295 - Amendment
Remove lines 42-56 and insert:
854947 - Amendment
Between lines 40 and 41, insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 115.135 -
+ − Sponsors (8)
Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Type:
Primary Sponsor