+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 495 (Ch. 2018-150)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 105 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/15/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Education Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Education Committee; Judiciary Committee
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
182213 - Amendment
Remove lines 27-37 and insert:
761531 - Amendment
Remove lines 21-29 and insert:
678455 - Strike All Amendment
Between lines 38 and 39, insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 5, 2018: Floor vote: H 515 c3
- Yeas: 105
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor