+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2018-50
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 1252
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Health Policy; Regulated Industries; Rules
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Health Policy; Regulated Industries; Rules
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/18/18, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
- Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
575795 - Amendment
Remove line 31 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 465.027 - Exceptions.
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2018: Floor vote: H 513
- Yeas: 36
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: H 513
- Yeas: 114
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor