+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Second Reading Calendar
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
- Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Education & Employment Committee
- Referred to Education & Employment Committee
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
- Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
- Favorable by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Post-Secondary Education and Lifelong Learning Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (7)
784607 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/16/2021)
Between lines 41 and 42, insert:
065305 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/16/2021)
Between lines 342 and 343, insert:
501311 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/16/2021)
Remove lines 527-537 and insert:
414499 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/16/2021)
Between lines 703 and 704, insert:
751957 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/16/2021)
Between lines 1008 and 1009, insert:
010257 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/16/2021)
Between lines 1107 and 1108, insert:
408057 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 3/16/2021)
Remove lines 1126-1127 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 1001.35 - Term of office.
- 1002.32 - Developmental research (laboratory) schools.
- 1002.321 - Digital learning.
- 1002.33 - Charter schools.
- 1002.331 - High-performing charter schools.
- 1002.333 - Persistently low-performing schools.
- 1002.45 - Virtual instruction programs.
- 1002.455 - Student eligibility for K-12 virtual instruction.
- 1003.493 - Career and professional academies and career-themed courses.
- 1008.3415 - School grade or school improvement rating for exceptional student education centers.
- 1012.32 - Qualifications of personnel.
- 1013.62 - Charter schools capital outlay funding.