+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 132 (Ch. 2015-11)
- Substituted CS/SB 132
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee, 02/04/15, 10:00 am, 116 Knott Building
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
950723 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 320.0848 - Persons who have disabilities; issuance of disabled parking permits; temporary permits; permits for certain providers of transportation services to persons who have disabilities.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor