+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2019-95, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- Passed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 2
- Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (963756)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- In returning messages
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (963756)
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Appropriations (963756); YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19
- Referred to Calendar
- Filed
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Amendment
963756 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: H 5011 Filed
- Yeas: 18
May 2, 2019: Floor vote: H 5011 Filed
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 2
May 1, 2019: Floor vote: H 5011 Filed
- Yeas: 36
April 4, 2019: Floor vote: H 5011 Filed
- Yeas: 112
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor