+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1113 (Ch. 2019-100), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Messages
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19
- Referred to Calendar
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
April 4, 2019: Floor vote: H 5009 Filed
- Yeas: 111
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor