+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2014-55, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51)
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report adopted (827711)
- Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 92 NAYS 25
- Conference Committee Report considered
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report received
- Conference Committee Report adopted (827711)
- Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Negron (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Smith (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice: Bradley (Chair), Altman, Clemens, Diaz de la Portilla, Evers, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education: Galvano (Chair), Abruzzo, Bullard, Detert, Legg, Montford, Sachs, Simmons, Thrasher; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government: Hays (Chair), Brandes, Braynon, Dean, Simpson, Soto, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services: Grimsley (Chair), Bean, Flores, Garcia, Gibson, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development: Gardiner (Chair), Hukill, Latvala, Lee, Margolis, Ring, Thompson
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee appointed: Representatives McKeel (Chair), Crisafulli (Co-Chair), Baxley (At Large), Coley (At Large), Gonzalez (At Large), Holder (At Large), O'Toole (At Large), Schenck (At Large), Workman (At Large), Young (At Large), Gibbons (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Thurston (At Large), Waldman (At Large), Williams, A. (At Large), Jones, M. (At Large)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Appropriations
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 95 NAYS 18
- Immediately certified
- Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Messages
- Received
- Referred to Appropriations
- Amendment(s) adopted (339034)
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for SB 2504
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 1
- The Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference
- Immediately certified
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- In returning messages
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/14
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
- Referred to Calendar
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
827711 - Conference Committee Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
339034 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Votes (4)
May 2, 2014: Floor vote: H 5007
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 25
May 2, 2014: Floor vote: H 5007
- Yeas: 40
April 3, 2014: Floor vote: H 5007
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 18
April 3, 2014: Floor vote: H 5007
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Appropriations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor