+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/20, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor