+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/03/14, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
- Favorable by Healthy Families Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Healthy Families Subcommittee, 03/25/14, 11:30 am, 12 HOB
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Healthy Families Subcommittee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- CS by K-12 Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 03/12/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Healthy Families Subcommittee; Education Committee
On January 6, 2014 in the House:
- Filed