+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Banking and Insurance
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary
- In Messages
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- Favorable by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 02/20/13, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
061043 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
404775 - Amendment
Remove lines 232-316 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2013: House floor vote on H 0493 c2
- Yeas: 116
April 17, 2013: Floor Vote: House
- Yeas: 116
+ − Sponsors (2)
Regulatory Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor