+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On September 17, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
- Referred to State Affairs Committee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
- Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
On August 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 112.1815 - Firefighters, paramedics, emergency medical technicians, and law enforcement officers; special provisions for employment-related accidents and injuries.