+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor