+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2018-149
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 762
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
- In Messages
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment(s) adopted (688447)
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/18/18, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
- Now in Commerce Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
On October 30, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
688447 - Amendment
Remove lines 51-67
457995 - Amendment
Remove lines 36-37 and insert:
366361 - Amendment
Remove lines 40-46 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 626.9541 - Unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices defined.
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2018: Floor vote: H 483 e1
- Yeas: 38
February 14, 2018: Floor vote: H 483 c2
- Yeas: 114
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor