+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 400)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor