+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Education Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Education Committee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/19/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
443615 - Amendment
Remove lines 291-302 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 1001.42 - Powers and duties of district school board.
- 1002.33 - Charter schools.
- 1002.36 - Florida School for the Deaf and the Blind.
- 1002.421 - Accountability of private schools participating in state school choice scholarship programs.
- 1002.45 - Virtual instruction programs.
- 1012.315 - Disqualification from employment.
- 1012.32 - Qualifications of personnel.
- 1012.465 - Background screening requirements for certain noninstructional school district employees and contractors.
- 1012.467 - Noninstructional contractors who are permitted access to school grounds when students are present; background screening requirements.
- 1012.56 - Educator certification requirements.
- 1012.795 - Education Practices Commission; authority to discipline.
- 1012.796 - Complaints against teachers and administrators; procedure; penalties.
- 1012.797 - Notification of district school superintendent of certain charges against or convictions of employees.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor