+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Appropriations Committee
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor