+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-114
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for SB 788
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Transportation; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
- In Messages
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
On March 8, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Economic Affairs Committee
- CS referred to Economic Affairs Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 1:30 pm, 116 Knott Building
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
638347 - Amendment
Remove lines 15-31 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 316.1964 - Exemption of vehicles transporting certain persons who have disabilities from payment of parking fees and penalties.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: H 0471 c1
- Yeas: 39
April 16, 2015: Floor vote: H 0471 c1
- Yeas: 113
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor