+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1108 (Ch. 2021-157)
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Education & Employment Committee
- Referred to Education & Employment Committee
- Original reference removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
- CS Filed
- Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
- Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with CS by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- PCS added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
- Referred to Education & Employment Committee
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 1003.42 - Required instruction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor