+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-145, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/SB 1106
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/11/15, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
770711 - Amendment
Remove lines 164-172 and insert:
420987 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2015: Floor vote: H 0465 c2
- Yeas: 38
April 16, 2015: Floor vote: H 0465 c2
- Yeas: 113
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor