+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 100)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 100)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On December 12, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
On November 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor