+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/11/14, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/14, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/20/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Health and Human Services Committee
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On December 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
573123 - Strike All Amendment
Remove lines 19-60 and insert: