+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2018 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1906A)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor