+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 526 (Ch. 2014-4)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/14
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/20/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/14, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
635217 - Amendment
Between lines 40 and 41, insert:
798015 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
686465 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor