+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Now in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 02/19/13, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed