+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
368109 - Amendment (Adopted without Objection 2/3/2020)
Remove line 84 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 985.265 - Detention transfer and release; education; adult jails.