+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2016-82
- Approved by Governor
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/SB 548
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
- In Messages
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/26/16
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 01/14/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee
- CS referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
On November 19, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 11/18/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
169625 - Amendment
Remove lines 22-23 and insert:
107629 - Amendment
Remove lines 24-30 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 627.778 - Limit of risk.
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2016: Floor vote: H 413 c2
- Yeas: 35
January 27, 2016: Floor vote: H 413 c2
- Yeas: 119
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor