+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1185)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On November 30, 2021 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On November 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor