+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Now in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- PCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 448.24 - Duties and rights.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor