+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter No. 2015-101
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 154
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received
- Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
- In Messages
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment(s) adopted (042521, 044363, 879827)
- Read 2nd time
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
- Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
- CS/CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/01/15, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
- Now in Education Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- CS/CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/09/15, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
On November 25, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (7)
042521 - Amendment
Between lines 187 and 188, insert:
879827 - Amendment
Between lines 27 and 28, insert:
044363 - Amendment
Remove lines 120-124 and insert:
424347 - Amendment
Between lines 27 and 28, insert:
490653 - Amendment
Remove lines 182-189 and insert:
579027 - Amendment
Remove lines 106-174 and insert:
873917 - Amendment
Remove lines 113-114 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: Floor vote: H 0041 e1
- Yeas: 39
April 16, 2015: Floor vote: H 0041 e1
- Yeas: 113