+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
250717 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 112.3173 - Felonies involving breach of public trust and other specified offenses by public officers and employees; forfeiture of retirement benefits.
- 921.0022 - Criminal Punishment Code; offense severity ranking chart.
- 944.365 -
- 944.47 - Introduction, removal, or possession of certain articles unlawful; penalty.