+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died in Judiciary Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Now in Judiciary Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
- Introduced
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 798.02 - Lewd and lascivious behavior.