+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1921A)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- See SB 2500 (line item 1921A)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor