+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1196)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- See HB 5001 (line item 1196)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Now in Appropriations Committee
- Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
On November 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor